Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 07/22/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 07/22/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 07/22/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 07/22/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 07/22/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/23/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/23/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/23/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/27/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/27/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 08/04/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 08/05/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 08/06/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 08/06/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 08/06/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 08/06/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/08/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/08/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/08/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/08/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/08/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/10/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 09/10/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/10/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/10/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/14/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/14/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/14/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/16/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 09/16/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/23/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/13/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/30/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 11/06/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 11/18/2009
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 12/03/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 12/16/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 12/17/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/23/2010
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/09/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 03/16/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/16/2010
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/23/2010
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/13/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/03/2010