There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Indian Arts and Crafts Amendments Act of 2009

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Indian Arts and Crafts Amendments Act of 2009

Short Titles as Introduced

Indian Arts and Crafts Amendments Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to protect Indian arts and crafts through the improvement of applicable criminal proceedings, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/24/2009Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8100-8101; text as passed Senate: CR S8100-8101)
07/22/2009Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Dorgan without amendment. Without written report.
01/06/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
08/19/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/24/2009HouseReferred to House Judiciary
07/24/2009HouseReferred to House Natural Resources
07/24/2009HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/24/2009SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/24/2009-5:13pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/24/2009SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8100-8101; text as passed Senate: CR S8100-8101)
07/22/2009SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 124.
07/22/2009SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Dorgan without amendment. Without written report.
04/30/2009SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/06/2009SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
01/06/2009SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S137)

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 01/06/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/17/2009

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs01/06/2009 Referred to
04/30/2009 Markup by
07/22/2009 Reported by
House Natural Resources07/24/2009 Referred to
House Judiciary07/24/2009 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security08/19/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.151. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (07/24/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

Indian Arts and Crafts Amendments Act of 2009 - Amends the Indian Arts and Crafts Act of 1990 to expand the authority of the Indian Arts and Crafts Board to bring criminal and civil actions for offenses under such Act involving the sale of misrepresented Indian produced goods or products. Authorizes: (1) any federal law enforcement officer to conduct an investigation of an alleged violation of this Act occurring within the jurisdiction of the United States; and (2) the Indian Arts and Crafts Board to refer an alleged violation to any federal law enforcement officer (currently, only to the Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)) for investigation. Permits federal law enforcement officers to investigate an alleged violation regardless of whether the Board makes a referral of an alleged violation.

Requires the findings of any investigation of an alleged violation to be submitted to a federal or state prosecuting authority or the Indian Arts and Crafts Board. Authorizes the Board, upon receiving the findings of such an investigation, to: (1) recommend to the Attorney General that criminal proceedings be initiated (current law); (2) provide such support to the Attorney General relating to the criminal proceedings as the Attorney General determines to be appropriate; or (3) recommend, in lieu of, or in addition to, any such criminal proceeding, that the Attorney General initiate a civil action. Allows the Attorney General, an Indian tribe, an Indian, or an Indian arts and crafts organization to initiate a civil action under this Act.

Amends the federal criminal code to revise penalties for the sale of misrepresented Indian produced goods and products.