Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 07/29/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 07/29/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 07/29/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 08/05/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/17/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/13/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 10/22/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/27/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 11/19/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/16/2010