Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 07/30/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 07/30/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 07/30/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/30/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 07/30/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 08/03/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 08/03/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 08/03/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 08/06/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/09/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/16/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/16/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 09/29/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/29/2009