Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 08/03/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 08/06/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/08/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/06/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/30/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/16/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/04/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 05/26/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/22/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/29/2010