Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 07/30/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/30/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 07/30/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 07/30/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/30/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 08/06/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/15/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 09/24/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/29/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 10/05/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 10/08/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/14/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 11/04/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/10/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/10/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 11/10/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 12/08/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 02/22/2010
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 02/22/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/17/2010