Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 07/31/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 07/31/2009
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 07/31/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 07/31/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 08/04/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/17/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/13/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/28/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 11/09/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 12/04/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 01/26/2010
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 01/28/2010
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/04/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 02/23/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/17/2010
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/18/2010
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 04/12/2010
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/06/2010
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/06/2010
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/24/2010
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/17/2010
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/23/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/28/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/12/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/15/2010
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/19/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/19/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/22/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/22/2010
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/27/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/28/2010
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/28/2010
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/29/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/29/2010
Sen. Goodwin, Carte Patrick [D-WV] 08/03/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/04/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 09/13/2010
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/13/2010
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/14/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/27/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 09/28/2010
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 11/17/2010