Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 08/05/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 08/06/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/24/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/15/2009
Sen. Kirk, Paul Grattan, Jr. [D-MA] 11/04/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 11/09/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 12/14/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 03/10/2010