Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 08/06/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 08/06/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 08/06/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 08/06/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA]* 08/06/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 08/06/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE]* 08/06/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/22/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/09/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 01/25/2010
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/27/2010
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/22/2010