Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 08/06/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 08/06/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/14/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/27/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/09/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 11/18/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 12/01/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/01/2010
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 02/02/2010
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 02/09/2010
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 02/09/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/25/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/15/2010
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/22/2010
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 05/27/2010