Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 09/10/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/17/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/25/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/29/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/05/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 10/06/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 10/07/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 10/08/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 10/19/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/19/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 10/22/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/22/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/28/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 11/02/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/09/2009
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 11/10/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 12/01/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 12/08/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/16/2010