Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 01/22/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 01/26/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 01/26/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/24/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/20/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/21/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 12/10/2010