Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 09/15/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 09/15/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/22/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/23/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/29/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/06/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/14/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/19/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 10/19/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/10/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/20/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 12/01/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/25/2010