There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Improving Access to Clinical Trials Act of 2009

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Improving Access to Clinical Trials Act of 2009

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Improving Access to Clinical Trials Act of 2009

Short Titles as Introduced

Improving Access to Clinical Trials Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for an exclusion under the Supplemental Security Income program and the Medicaid program for compensation provided to individuals who participate in clinical trials for rare diseases or conditions.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/05/2010Became Public Law No: 111-255. (TXT | PDF)
10/05/2010Signed by President.
09/24/2010Presented to President.
09/23/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6892)
08/05/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S6979-6980)
08/05/2010Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6979-6980)
09/15/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
10/05/2010Became Public Law No: 111-255. (TXT | PDF)
10/05/2010Signed by President.
09/24/2010SenatePresented to President.
09/23/2010-11:41amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/23/2010-11:41amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6892)
09/23/2010-11:16amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1674.
09/23/2010-11:16amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6891-6896)
09/23/2010-11:16amHouseMr. McDermott moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/09/2010-8:39pmHouseHeld at the desk.
08/09/2010-7:07pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/06/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/05/2010SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6979-6980)
08/05/2010SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6979-6980)
09/15/2009SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
09/15/2009SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S9379)

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance09/15/2009 Referred to
08/05/2010 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1674. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-255 (10/05/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Improving Access to Clinical Trials Act of 2009 - Amends title XVI (Supplemental Security Income) (SSI) of the Social Security Act (SSA) to exclude from income for SSI eligibility purposes any compensation in the amount of the first $2,000 per year received by an individual for participation in clinical trials involving research and testing of treatments for rare diseases or conditions.

Amends SSA title XIX (Medicaid) to make a similar exclusion from income of such compensation for the purposes of eligibility under the Medicaid program.

Directs the Comptroller General to study and report to Congress on the impact of this Act on enrollment of individuals who receive SSI benefits in clinical trials for rare diseases or conditions.