Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 09/15/2009
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 09/15/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 09/15/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/16/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/25/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/25/2009
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 01/27/2010
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/26/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/04/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/14/2010
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/20/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/10/2010
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/16/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/24/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/29/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/30/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/14/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/15/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/22/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 09/14/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/14/2010