Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 09/16/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 09/16/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 09/16/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 09/16/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/24/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/24/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/30/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/30/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/06/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 10/06/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/08/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/19/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 10/19/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/26/2009