Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 09/23/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/29/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 09/30/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 10/01/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/06/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 10/26/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/15/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/16/2010
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 03/22/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/29/2010