Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 09/17/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 09/17/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 09/17/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/24/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 10/05/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/07/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/15/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 10/15/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/19/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/27/2009