Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 09/23/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 09/23/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 09/23/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 09/23/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 09/23/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/06/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/13/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/15/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/19/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/09/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/10/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/11/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/19/2010