Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 09/29/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 09/29/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 09/29/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/14/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/15/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 10/21/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/03/2009