Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 09/30/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 09/30/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 09/30/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 10/07/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/19/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/21/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/26/2009