Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 10/01/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 10/05/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/08/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 10/22/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/26/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 12/02/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 01/20/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/01/2010
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 03/09/2010
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/10/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 03/10/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/10/2010