Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 10/05/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/06/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/13/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 10/21/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/15/2009