Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 10/14/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 10/14/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/27/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/27/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/04/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 11/19/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/20/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 12/03/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/09/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 11/15/2010