Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 10/14/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 10/14/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/15/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/03/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/05/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/08/2010