There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Fair Sentencing Act of 2010

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Fair Sentencing Act of 2010

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Fair Sentencing Act of 2010

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Fair Sentencing Act of 2010

Short Titles as Introduced

Fair Sentencing Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to restore fairness to Federal cocaine sentencing.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
08/03/2010Became Public Law No: 111-220. (TXT | PDF)
08/03/2010Signed by President.
07/29/2010Presented to President.
07/28/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6196-6197)
03/17/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1680-1683; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1682)
03/15/2010Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
10/15/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
08/03/2010Became Public Law No: 111-220. (TXT | PDF)
08/03/2010Signed by President.
07/29/2010SenatePresented to President.
07/28/2010-1:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/28/2010-1:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6196-6197)
07/28/2010-1:19pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1789.
07/28/2010-1:19pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6196-6204)
07/28/2010-1:19pmHouseMr. Scott (VA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/15/2010HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/18/2010HouseReferred to House Energy and Commerce
03/18/2010HouseReferred to House Judiciary
03/18/2010HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/18/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/18/2010-10:02amHouseReceived in the House.
03/17/2010SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1680-1683; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1682)
03/15/2010SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 316.
03/15/2010SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/11/2010SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/15/2009SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
10/15/2009SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S10490-10492)

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary10/15/2009 Referred to
03/11/2010 Markup by
03/15/2010 Reported by
House Judiciary03/18/2010 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security06/15/2010 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce03/18/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.1789. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-220 (08/03/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on March 15, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Fair Sentencing Act of 2010 - Amends the Controlled Substances Act and the Controlled Substances Import and Export Act to: (1) increase the amount of a controlled substance or mixture containing a cocaine base (i.e., crack cocaine) required for the imposition of mandatory minimum prison terms for trafficking; and (2) increase monetary penalties for drug trafficking and for the importation and exportation of controlled substances.

Eliminates the five-year mandatory minimum prison term for first-time possession of crack cocaine.

Directs the United States Sentencing Commission to: (1) review and amend its sentencing guidelines to increase sentences for defendants convicted of using violence during a drug trafficking offense; (2) incorporate aggravating and mitigating factors in its guidelines for drug trafficking offenses; (3) promulgate guidelines, policy statements, or amendments required by this Act as soon as practicable, but not later than 90 days after the enactment of this Act; and (4) study and report to Congress on the impact of changes in sentencing law under this Act.

Directs the Comptroller General, within one year after the enactment of this Act, to report to Congress analyzing the effectiveness of drug court programs under the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968.