Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/27/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/02/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 11/03/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/18/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 01/26/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/15/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/15/2010
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/16/2010
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/13/2010
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/13/2010
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/13/2010
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 04/13/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/15/2010