Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 10/15/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 10/19/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/02/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/03/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/17/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/20/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 12/11/2009