Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/08/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 01/09/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 01/09/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/25/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/02/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/05/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 03/16/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 04/27/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 04/28/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/24/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/28/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/11/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 11/09/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 11/19/2009
Sen. Kirk, Paul Grattan, Jr. [D-MA] 02/01/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/22/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/20/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/21/2010
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/27/2010
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/06/2010