Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/22/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/22/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/22/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 10/22/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/22/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/26/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/28/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 10/28/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 10/28/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 10/29/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 11/03/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/04/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 11/10/2009