Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 10/21/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 10/21/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 10/21/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 10/21/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/26/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/27/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/28/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/29/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/30/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 11/02/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/02/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 11/09/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/25/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/14/2010