Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 10/22/2009
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 10/22/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 10/22/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/26/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/04/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 11/05/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/19/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 11/30/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 12/01/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 12/02/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/03/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 12/11/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 12/14/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 12/14/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 12/16/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 01/20/2010
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 01/20/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 01/21/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 01/22/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 02/02/2010
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/04/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/04/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/22/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/23/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/03/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/10/2010
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/10/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/17/2010
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/22/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/26/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/24/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/26/2010
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/09/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/17/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/18/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/22/2010
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/15/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/16/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/21/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 11/17/2010