Text: S.1879 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (10/26/2009)


111th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. 1879


To clarify the tariff classification of certain fiberboard core and laminate boards and panels, and for other purposes.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

October 26, 2009

Mr. Casey introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance


A BILL

To clarify the tariff classification of certain fiberboard core and laminate boards and panels, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Medium density fiberboard.

(a) Finding.—Congress finds that, pursuant to Presidential Proclamation 8097, dated December 27, 2006 (72 Fed. Reg. 453), chapter 44 of the Harmonized Tariff Schedule of the United States was amended, effective February 3, 2007, to include laminate boards bonded in whole or in part, or impregnated, with synthetic resins as medium density fiberboard in the article descriptions for subheadings 4411.12.20, 4411.13.20, and 4411.14.20.

(b) Retroactive application to certain entries.—Notwithstanding section 514 of the Tariff Act of 1930 (19 U.S.C. 1514) or any other provision of law, upon proper request filed with U.S. Customs and Border Protection before the date that is 90 days after the date of the enactment of this Act, any entry, or withdrawal from warehouse for consumption, of any goods described in subheading 4411.12.20, 4411.13.20, or 4411.14.20 of the Harmonized Tariff Schedule of the United States (as in effect on the day before the date of the enactment of this Act) that was made—

(1) on or after January 1, 1994, and

(2) on or before March 1, 2001,

shall be liquidated or reliquidated as though the amendment described in subsection (a) applied to the entry or withdrawal.