Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 10/26/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 10/26/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 10/26/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 10/26/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 10/26/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 10/26/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 10/26/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 10/28/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/28/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 10/28/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/28/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/28/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 10/30/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/30/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 10/30/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 11/02/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/04/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/09/2009
Sen. Kirk, Paul Grattan, Jr. [D-MA] 11/09/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/30/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/22/2009