Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 10/27/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 10/27/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 10/27/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 10/27/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 10/27/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 10/29/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 11/17/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 12/08/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 12/17/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/06/2010