Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA]* 10/27/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 10/27/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 10/27/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 10/27/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/09/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 11/09/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/10/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 11/20/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 11/20/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 12/07/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 12/07/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 12/22/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 01/22/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/04/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/05/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/15/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/13/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/19/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/26/2010