Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 10/28/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 10/28/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 12/01/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/01/2010
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/01/2010
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/17/2010
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/22/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/26/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/18/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/08/2010