Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/12/2009
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 01/28/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/23/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/19/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 08/05/2009