Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA]* 10/29/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 10/29/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/09/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/10/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 11/20/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 11/21/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 11/30/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 12/02/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 12/02/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 12/04/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/04/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 12/07/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/15/2010