Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 01/13/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/15/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 01/28/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/11/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/11/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/11/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/11/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/12/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/16/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/17/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/17/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/24/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 04/27/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/04/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/06/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/11/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/11/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/01/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/01/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/04/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/10/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/16/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/07/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/15/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/21/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/24/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/29/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 08/05/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 08/06/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/09/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 10/14/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/27/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 01/22/2010
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/18/2010
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/13/2010
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 04/13/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/30/2010
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/26/2010