Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/12/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 01/27/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/10/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/23/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/16/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/08/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/18/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/07/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/21/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/30/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/05/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/06/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/22/2010