Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/09/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 02/09/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/09/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/27/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/20/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/04/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/15/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/16/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/16/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/23/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/23/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 08/04/2009