Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 01/22/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 01/30/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/12/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 07/30/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 08/03/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 08/04/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/20/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/21/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/10/2009