There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Combat Methamphetamine Enhancement Act of 2009

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Combat Methamphetamine Enhancement Act of 2009

Short Titles as Introduced

Combat Methamphetamine Enhancement Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to enhance the ability to combat methamphetamine.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/08/2009Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6315-6316; text as passed Senate: CR S6315-6316)
03/23/2009Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report.
01/15/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
08/19/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/09/2009HouseReferred to House Judiciary
06/09/2009HouseReferred to House Energy and Commerce
06/09/2009HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/09/2009SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/09/2009-10:31amHouseReceived in the House.
06/08/2009SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6315-6316; text as passed Senate: CR S6315-6316)
03/23/2009SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 38.
03/23/2009SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report.
03/05/2009SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported favorably.
01/15/2009SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S615)
01/15/2009SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S614-615)

Cosponsors (19)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 01/15/2009
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/15/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 01/21/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 01/27/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/23/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/30/2009
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 01/15/2009 01/21/2009 --

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary01/15/2009 Referred to
03/23/2009 Reported by
House Energy and Commerce06/09/2009 Referred to
House Judiciary06/09/2009 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security08/19/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.256. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (06/08/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Combat Methamphetamine Enhancement Act of 2009 - Amends the Controlled Substances Act to require all regulated retail sellers of certain listed chemical products used to make methamphetamine to submit self-certifications of compliance with the requirements of such Act to the Attorney General.

Requires the Attorney General to develop a list of all self-certified individuals and make it publicly available on the website of the Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA).

Prohibits distributors of listed chemical products from selling such products to individuals not currently registered with the DEA.

Impose civil penalties for negligent failure to self-certify as required by this Act.