Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/15/2009
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/15/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/15/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 01/21/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 01/27/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/23/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/30/2009

Show cosponsors who withdrew