Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 10/30/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 11/17/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/18/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 12/01/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/26/2010
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/26/2010