Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/09/2010
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/09/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/09/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 02/09/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/11/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/18/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/19/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/23/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/14/2010
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/17/2010