Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 11/06/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/04/2010
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 02/23/2010
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/23/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/11/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/22/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/26/2010