Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 11/09/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 11/09/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 11/09/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 11/09/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 11/09/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 11/09/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 11/16/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/17/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 12/03/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 01/20/2010
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 02/25/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/05/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/11/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 03/22/2010