Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/16/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/16/2009
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/16/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/16/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/16/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/16/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 01/16/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/16/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 01/16/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/16/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/16/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/16/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 01/16/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 01/16/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/16/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/16/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 01/16/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/16/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 01/16/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 01/16/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/25/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/02/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/09/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 03/10/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/12/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/16/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 03/16/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/17/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/17/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/18/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/18/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/18/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/19/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/19/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/19/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 03/23/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/23/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/24/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 03/25/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/25/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/26/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/26/2009